SD HCR1006 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 86-14)
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorating the life of George Speaker Mickelson and calling for a bust of Mickelson to be displayed in the lobby of the State House of Representatives.
Title
Commemorating the life of George Speaker Mickelson and calling for a bust of Mickelson to be displayed in the lobby of the State House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 364 |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced S.J. 350 |
2018-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 277 |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced H.J. 244 |