SD HCR1007 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate Adopt Resolution, Failed, YEAS 8, NAYS 25. S.J. 658
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing and encouraging support for voluntary country-of-origin labels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing and encouraging support for voluntary country-of-origin labels.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 8 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseSenate Adopt Resolution, Failed, YEAS 8, NAYS 25. S.J. 658
2019-03-05HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Title amended, Passed S.J. 605 Amendment c1007jta
2019-03-05HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2019-03-05HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Hoghoused, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. Amendment c1007ja
2019-03-05HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment c1007ka
2019-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 537
2019-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 22. H.J. 550
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 517
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced H.J. 482

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback