SD HJR1003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing and submitting to the voters at the next general election a new section to Article XII of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to the creation and administration of a trust fund using the net receipts from unclaimed property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing and submitting to the voters at the next general election a new section to Article XII of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to the creation and administration of a trust fund using the net receipts from unclaimed property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseSenate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 563
2019-03-04HouseSenate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22HouseFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 476
2019-02-21SenateHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 29. H.J. 473
2019-02-20SenateHouse Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. H.J. 446
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05SenateReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 201

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback