SD HJR1004 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rescinding House Joint Resolutions calling for a constitutional convention, or convention of the states, for the purpose of amending the Constitution of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rescinding House Joint Resolutions calling for a constitutional convention, or convention of the states, for the purpose of amending the Constitution of the United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseDelivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 596
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-27HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 579
2019-02-26HouseSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 523
2019-02-25HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 498
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13HouseFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 369
2019-02-12SenateHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 378
2019-02-08SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 337
2019-02-08SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment j1004oa
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28SenateReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 219
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading House H.J. 206

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback