SD HJR1005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 39. H.J. 354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 39. H.J. 354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To apply for a convention of states under Article V of the Constitution of the United States to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, to limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and to limit the terms of office for federal officials and members of Congress.
Title
To apply for a convention of states under Article V of the Constitution of the United States to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, to limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and to limit the terms of office for federal officials and members of Congress.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 28 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Reconsidered (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Reconsidered (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 39. H.J. 354 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 337 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed H.J. 327 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 304 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 6. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 219 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Fiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 218 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First Reading House H.J. 207 |