SD SB10 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions pertaining to boating while under the influence.
Title
Revise certain provisions pertaining to boating while under the influence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor S.J. 672 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 624 | |
2012-02-28 | Signed by President S.J. 605 | |
2012-02-27 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 45, NAYS 24. H.J. 638 | |
2012-02-24 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 614 | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 485 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 424 | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 379 | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 10oa | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 10jb | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-09 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 14 |