SD SB100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reduce the number of petition signatures required for conservation district supervisor elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce the number of petition signatures required for conservation district supervisor elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 18. H.J. 573
2019-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 543
2019-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 473
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
2019-02-19HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 430
2019-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 292
2019-01-31SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 251
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-30SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 224
2019-01-30SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 167

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback