SD SB101 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize counties to borrow money using promissory notes.
Title
Authorize counties to borrow money using promissory notes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor S.J. 672 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 624 | |
2012-02-28 | Signed by President S.J. 605 | |
2012-02-27 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 23. H.J. 636 | |
2012-02-24 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 609 | |
2012-02-23 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 564 | |
2012-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 297 | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 246 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-30 | Local Government Title amended, Passed Amendment 101tta | |
2012-01-30 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 207 | |
2012-01-30 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 101ta | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 127 |