SD SB103 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 20. S.J. 334
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 20. S.J. 334
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for an annual transfer of certain unobligated state general funds into the local bridge improvement grant fund.
Title
Provide for an annual transfer of certain unobligated state general funds into the local bridge improvement grant fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 20. S.J. 334 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 320 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 276 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 103za |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 183 |