SD SB104 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding disclosure of public information and public meetings.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding disclosure of public information and public meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-12 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 670 | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 847 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 637 | |
2010-03-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 782 | |
2010-03-04 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 709 | |
2010-03-04 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 104fc | |
2010-03-04 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 104jg | |
2010-03-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 602 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 441 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 440 Amendment 104fa | |
2010-02-22 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 392 | |
2010-02-22 | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 104jd | |
2010-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 147 |