SD SB11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 S.J. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 S.J. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the granting of work permits to minors who refuse to submit to chemical analyses.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the granting of work permits to minors who refuse to submit to chemical analyses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 S.J. 271 |
2019-01-31 | House | Delivered to the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 246 |
2019-01-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 273 |
2019-01-30 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 220 |
2019-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 235 |
2019-01-28 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-28 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 217 |
2019-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 146 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 128 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 108 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 95 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 23 |