SD SB115 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Implement the regulation of insurance coverage for portable electronic devices.
Title
Implement the regulation of insurance coverage for portable electronic devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Signed by Governor S.J. 640 | |
2012-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 533 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 508 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-15 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 481 | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-06 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 314 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 263 | |
2012-01-31 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-31 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 225 | |
2012-01-31 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 115sa | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 130 |