SD SB115 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permit car rental companies to include certain fees in a rental agreement.
Title
Permit car rental companies to include certain fees in a rental agreement.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] | Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] |
Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] |
Rep. Fred Romkema [R] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] |
Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Rep. Dan Dryden [R] | Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] | Rep. Paula Hawks [D] |
Rep. Roger Solum [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Tabled (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Deferred to another day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Deferred to another day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 333 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 165 |