SD SB115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the conditional carrying of a concealed pistol in the state capitol by certain persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the conditional carrying of a concealed pistol in the state capitol by certain persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 18, 2019 S.J. 732
2019-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 S.J. 642
2019-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 670
2019-03-05HouseSigned by the President S.J. 618
2019-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 19. H.J. 609
2019-02-28HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 591
2019-02-27HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 562
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-21HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 463
2019-02-20SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 13. S.J. 433
2019-02-14SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 381
2019-02-14SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 115ya
2019-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 185

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback