SD SB117 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the partners in education tax credit program.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the partners in education tax credit program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756 |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2018 S.J. 736 |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 646 |
2018-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 9. H.J. 629 |
2018-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 611 |
2018-02-23 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 568 |
2018-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 390 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 404 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 380 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 199 |