SD SB12 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2019 S.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2019 S.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions pertaining to the disqualification of commercial driver license holders for failure to consent to chemical analyses.
Title
Revise certain provisions pertaining to the disqualification of commercial driver license holders for failure to consent to chemical analyses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2019 S.J. 326 |
2019-02-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 06, 2019 S.J. 278 |
2019-02-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 301 |
2019-01-31 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 256 |
2019-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 272 |
2019-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 241 |
2019-01-28 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 216 |
2019-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 146 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 125 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 107 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 95 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 23 |