SD SB12 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update a reference to the U.S. Board on Geographic Names standards manual.
Title
Update a reference to the U.S. Board on Geographic Names standards manual.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 05, 2021 S.J. 199 |
2021-02-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 218 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 174 |
2021-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 6. H.J. 183 |
2021-02-01 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 167 |
2021-01-28 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 110 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 88 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-01-20 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16 |