SD SB120 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to consent to sexual activity.
Title
Revise provisions related to consent to sexual activity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 756 |
2013-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 712 |
2013-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 773 |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by President S.J. 688 |
2013-03-04 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 7. S.J. 641 |
2013-02-28 | House | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 626 |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 555 |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 555 Amendment 120oa |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 535 |
2013-02-22 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 507 |
2013-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 283 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 293 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 276 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 166 |