SD SB121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding manufacturers' warranties for motor vehicles to include all-terrain vehicles.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding manufacturers' warranties for motor vehicles to include all-terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678 |
2019-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 622 |
2019-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 569 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 550 |
2019-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486 |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-21 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 549 |
2019-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-05 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 292 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 253 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 220 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 186 |