SD SB124 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 17, 2017 S.J. 748
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 17, 2017 S.J. 748
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the authority for the Department of Social Services to enter agreements related to the Refugee Act of 1980 and to require certain reports regarding services provided to and arrival of refugees.
Title
Repeal the authority for the Department of Social Services to enter agreements related to the Refugee Act of 1980 and to require certain reports regarding services provided to and arrival of refugees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 17, 2017 S.J. 748 |
2017-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2017 S.J. 677 |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 655 |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2017-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 654 |
2017-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 612 |
2017-03-01 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 586 |
2017-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 462 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 455 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 124fa |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 218 |