SD SB126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the common language of the state and to recognize the official indigenous language of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the common language of the state and to recognize the official indigenous language of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the President S.J. 647
2019-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 6. H.J. 664
2019-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 605
2019-02-28HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 591
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-27HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 562
2019-02-13HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 393
2019-02-12SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 356 Amendment 126dta
2019-02-12SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 353
2019-02-12SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 353 Amendment 126kb
2019-02-08SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 312
2019-02-08SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 126ca
2019-02-08SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 126ka
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 187

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback