SD SB127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the requirements for placement of a utility facility across a railroad right-of-way.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the requirements for placement of a utility facility across a railroad right-of-way.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618 |
2016-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2016 S.J. 585 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 555 |
2016-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 1. H.J. 779 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 749 |
2016-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 700 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 438 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 436 Amendment 127jc |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 421 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 372 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 127fa |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 176 |