SD SB128 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding ballot question committees.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding ballot question committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793 |
2018-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 S.J. 776 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 684 |
2018-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 669 |
2018-02-28 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 642 |
2018-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-13 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 420 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 435 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 422 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 397 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 224 |