SD SB128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to the gaming commission fund, to provide for the transfer of funds to the special racing revolving fund and the South Dakota-bred racing fund, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to the gaming commission fund, to provide for the transfer of funds to the special racing revolving fund and the South Dakota-bred racing fund, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
2019-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 756
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the President S.J. 716
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 12. H.J. 744
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 733 Amendment Cc128b
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, appoint Conference Committee, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 29. H.J. 726
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 6. S.J. 711
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 702 Amendment Cc128b
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 702 Amendment Cc128b
2019-03-12HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 694
2019-03-11HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 713 Amendment Cc128a
2019-03-11HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 683 Amendment Cc128a
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 696
2019-03-07HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 659
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 14. H.J. 639
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 639 Amendment 128ta
2019-03-04HouseFirst read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 603
2019-02-28SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 552
2019-02-25SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 4. S.J. 516
2019-02-25SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 128ma
2019-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 188

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=128&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB128P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB128JAP.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB128H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB128CNF.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB128ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28779&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29023&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29184&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29461&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29437&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29494&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback