SD SB129 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempt motor vehicles owned by licensed ambulance services from certain motor vehicle registration fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt motor vehicles owned by licensed ambulance services from certain motor vehicle registration fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
2019-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 393
2019-02-12HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-12HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 368
2019-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 292
2019-01-31SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 251
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-30SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 220
2019-01-30SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 188

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback