SD SB13 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding authorization for public transportation assistance grants.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding authorization for public transportation assistance grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260 |
2019-01-30 | House | Delivered to the Governor on January 30, 2019 S.J. 224 |
2019-01-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 241 |
2019-01-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 203 |
2019-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 208 |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-24 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 167 |
2019-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 130 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 98 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 70 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 23 |
Subjects
Administrative Rules
Public Officers and Employees
State Affairs and Government
Transportation Commission
Public Officers and Employees
State Affairs and Government
Transportation Commission