SD SB131 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-9)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-9)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish certain provisions regarding stray electrical current and voltage remediation.
Title
Establish certain provisions regarding stray electrical current and voltage remediation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 718 |
2015-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 689 |
2015-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 730 |
2015-03-11 | House | Signed by President S.J. 666 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 682 |
2015-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 669 |
2015-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643 |
2015-03-05 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 604 |
2015-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-20 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 470 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 452 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 439 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 405 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 212 |