SD SB134 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for divestiture of state investment funds in certain companies liable to sanctions under the Iran Sanctions Act of 1996.
Title
Provide for divestiture of state investment funds in certain companies liable to sanctions under the Iran Sanctions Act of 1996.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 622 | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 5. H.J. 747 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 709 | |
2010-03-03 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 670 | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-19 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 493 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 7. S.J. 373 | |
2010-02-17 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 349 | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 166 |