SD SB135 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the bid limit for certain public improvements.
Title
Increase the bid limit for certain public improvements.
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Helene Duhamel [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R] |
Rep. John Mills [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 S.J. 557 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 8. H.J. 530 |
2020-03-05 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-05 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 433 |
2020-02-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 257 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 177 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 119 |