SD SB145 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit rebates and regulate contracts for residential roofing goods and services.
Title
Prohibit rebates and regulate contracts for residential roofing goods and services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] |
Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Rep. Tad Perry [R] | Rep. Val Rausch [R] | Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Rep. Mark Willadsen [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Placed on consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Placed on consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor S.J. 672 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 624 | |
2012-02-28 | Signed by President S.J. 605 | |
2012-02-27 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 632 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 610 | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-13 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 432 | |
2012-02-10 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 370 | |
2012-02-07 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 291 | |
2012-02-07 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 145ja | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 156 |