SD SB146 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding licenses for speech-language pathology services.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding licenses for speech-language pathology services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Education Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Education Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733 |
2019-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 756 |
2019-03-12 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 716 |
2019-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 11. H.J. 731 |
2019-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar, Passed H.J. 731 |
2019-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 728 Amendment Cc146a |
2019-03-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 699 |
2019-03-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 690 Amendment Cc146a |
2019-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 715 |
2019-03-11 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 681 |
2019-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 2. H.J. 697 |
2019-03-06 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 657 |
2019-03-06 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 4. Amendment 146bb |
2019-03-06 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 146kb |
2019-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 372 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 336 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 320 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 299 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 200 |