SD SB148 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 565
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 565
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for state employee protection from retaliation for certain communications.
Title
Provide for state employee protection from retaliation for certain communications.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Wismer [D] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Sen. Lynn Disanto [R] | Sen. Red Foster [D] |
Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Craig Kennedy [D] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] |
Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Steven McCleerey [D] | Sen. Shawn Bordeaux [D] |
Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Ryan Cwach [D] | Rep. Drew Dennert [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] |
Rep. Caleb Finck [R] | Rep. Erin Healy [D] | Sen. David Johnson [R] | Rep. Rhonda Milstead [R] |
Rep. Peri Pourier [D] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] | Rep. Michael Saba [D] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] |
Rep. Kelly Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 565 |
2019-02-27 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 148wa |
2019-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 416 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 13. S.J. 371 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 327 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 148ca |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 200 |