SD SB149 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increase the amount authorized for certain brand fees and to authorize a brand registration application fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase the amount authorized for certain brand fees and to authorize a brand registration application fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-06HouseSigned by the President S.J. 637
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 7. H.J. 636
2019-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 612
2019-02-28HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 583
2019-02-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-19HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 432
2019-02-14SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 390 Amendment 149jta
2019-02-14SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 6. S.J. 390
2019-02-12SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 340
2019-02-12SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 149ja
2019-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-29SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 212

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback