SD SB151 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2017 S.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2017 S.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide certain provisions regarding investigations of misconduct by certain public officials.
Title
Provide certain provisions regarding investigations of misconduct by certain public officials.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2017 S.J. 747 |
2017-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743 |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 744 |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 759 |
2017-03-10 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 740 |
2017-03-10 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 735 Amendment Cc151b |
2017-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 754 |
2017-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 751 Amendment Cc151b |
2017-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 748 |
2017-03-09 | House | Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 722 |
2017-03-09 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 717 |
2017-03-09 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 715 Amendment Cc151a |
2017-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 735 Amendment Cc151a |
2017-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 715 |
2017-03-08 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 680 |
2017-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 697 |
2017-03-06 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 647 |
2017-03-06 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 151ja |
2017-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 536 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 16. S.J. 547 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 493 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 151ob |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-15 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 151oa |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 251 |