SD SB154 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the maximum weight allowed on certain wide-based super single tires.
Title
Revise the maximum weight allowed on certain wide-based super single tires.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 756 |
2013-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 712 |
2013-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 773 |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by President S.J. 688 |
2013-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 0. H.J. 638 |
2013-02-28 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-28 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 590 |
2013-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 480 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 491 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 424 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 154oa |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 173 |