SD SB157 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the county zoning and appeals process.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the county zoning and appeals process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 540 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 620 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 524 |
2020-03-11 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 7. S.J. 486 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 45, NAYS 22. H.J. 519 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 26. H.J. 518 Amendment 157H |
2020-03-04 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 423 |
2020-02-24 | House | First Reading House H.J. 360 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 311 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 310 Amendment 157C |
2020-02-19 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 157A |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 141 |