SD SB159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for reimbursement of certain fire and rescue services.
Title
Provide for reimbursement of certain fire and rescue services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 452 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 227 |