SD SB16 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish certain provisions regarding financial security for the decommissioning of wind turbines.
Title
Establish certain provisions regarding financial security for the decommissioning of wind turbines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732 |
2019-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672 |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 647 |
2019-03-06 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 631 |
2019-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 15. H.J. 608 |
2019-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 591 |
2019-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 590 Amendment 16ca |
2019-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 571 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557 |
2019-02-25 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 515 |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 160 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 4. S.J. 144 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 121 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 108 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 96 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 24 |