SD SB161 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning public meetings held by teleconference or videoconference.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning public meetings held by teleconference or videoconference.
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Rep. Dennis Feickert [D] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Art Fryslie [R] |
Sen. Phyllis Heineman [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Burt Tulson [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor S.J. 672 | |
2012-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 640 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by President S.J. 633 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 627 | |
2012-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 646 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-24 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 598 | |
2012-02-24 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 161ob | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-09 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 391 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 326 | |
2012-02-06 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 275 | |
2012-02-06 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 161oa | |
2012-02-06 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 173 |