SD SB164 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish procedures for the investigation of certain missing and murdered indigenous persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish procedures for the investigation of certain missing and murdered indigenous persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 679
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 710
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the President S.J. 675
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 699
2019-03-06HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 651
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-19HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 432
2019-02-14SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 392 Amendment 164kta
2019-02-14SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 391
2019-02-14SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 391 Amendment 164ka
2019-02-12SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 363
2019-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 228

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback