SD SB167 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise a provision regarding eligibility for the South Dakota opportunity scholarship.
Title
Revise a provision regarding eligibility for the South Dakota opportunity scholarship.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] |
Sen. Jim White [R] | Rep. Lana Greenfield [R] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Sen. Shawn Bordeaux [D] |
Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Lance Koth [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] |
Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Rep. Manny Steele [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 451 |
2020-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 469 |
2020-03-02 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-02 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-02 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 167C |
2020-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 423 |
2020-02-24 | House | First Reading House H.J. 360 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 309 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 307 Amendment 167A |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 292 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 256 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education S.J. 168 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 164 |