SD SB168 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-14)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-14)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a task force to study elder abuse in South Dakota.
Title
Establish a task force to study elder abuse in South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 714 |
2015-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 662 |
2015-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 713 |
2015-03-09 | House | Signed by President S.J. 643 |
2015-03-06 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 622 |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 589 |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-27 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 552 |
2015-02-27 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 168oa |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 409 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 397 Amendment 168rta |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 396 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 396 Amendment 168rc |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 381 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 354 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 346 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 296 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Retirement Laws Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 168ya |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Retirement Laws Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 168ra |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 233 |