SD SB168 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to human trafficking and to provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Revise provisions related to human trafficking and to provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2016 S.J. 619 |
2016-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 610 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 871 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 602 |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 589 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 818 |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-07 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 785 |
2016-03-07 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 168ra |
2016-03-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 700 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 434 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 408 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 217 |