SD SB169 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 S.J. 792
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 S.J. 792
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding confections that contain alcohol and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding confections that contain alcohol and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 S.J. 792 |
2018-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 S.J. 776 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 759 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 742 |
2018-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 5. H.J. 707 |
2018-03-05 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 679 |
2018-03-05 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 169jb |
2018-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 577 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 561 Amendment 169ftb |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 561 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hoghoused, Passed S.J. 560 Amendment 169fb |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 500 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 431 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 422 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 396 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 246 |