SD SB17 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-25 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-25 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding certain indemnity bonds that the Public Utilities Commission may require.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding certain indemnity bonds that the Public Utilities Commission may require.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Tabled (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-25 | House | Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 181 |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 147 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 124 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 96 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 17wa |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 24 |