SD SB174 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the purposes for which a school district's capital outlay fund may be used.
Title
Revise the purposes for which a school district's capital outlay fund may be used.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558 |
2020-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2020 S.J. 474 |
2020-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2020-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 18. H.J. 476 |
2020-03-02 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-02 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 422 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 356 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 155 |