SD SB19 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain mandatory reporting requirements for elder and disabled adult abuse and neglect.
Title
Revise certain mandatory reporting requirements for elder and disabled adult abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618 |
2016-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2016 S.J. 585 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 555 |
2016-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 1. H.J. 779 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-02 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 750 |
2016-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 135 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 87 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 56 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 17 |