SD SB190 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify health coverage for applied behavior analysis, and to establish the Applied Behavior Analysis Provider Workgroup.
Title
Clarify health coverage for applied behavior analysis, and to establish the Applied Behavior Analysis Provider Workgroup.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Solano [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] |
Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Rep. Steve Westra [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 736 |
2015-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 731 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 785 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by President S.J. 726 |
2015-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 757 |
2015-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 754 Amendment cc190a |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 710 |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 708 Amendment Cc190a |
2015-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 723 |
2015-03-11 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 665 |
2015-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 668 |
2015-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643 |
2015-03-04 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 584 |
2015-03-04 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 190cb |
2015-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 401 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 375 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 337 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 190rb |
2015-02-09 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 190ra |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 263 |