SD SB191 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions providing for the sales tax on food refund program.
Title
Revise certain provisions providing for the sales tax on food refund program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 692 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 670 | |
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 16. H.J. 640 | |
2011-03-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 609 | |
2011-02-28 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 543 | |
2011-02-28 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 191oa | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 515 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 513 Amendment 191fta | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 513 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 511 Amendment 191fa | |
2011-02-22 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 475 | |
2011-02-22 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 191ma | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-10 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 246 |