SD SB191 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 737
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 737
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Title
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 737 |
2019-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 756 |
2019-03-12 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 729 |
2019-03-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 6. H.J. 755 |
2019-03-13 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 753 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed H.J. 753 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 2. S.J. 727 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 727 |